This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 12:26:33 (UTC).

EBONIE DANIECE THOMPSON, ET AL. VS HYGINUS MMEJE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 EBONIE DANIECE THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HYGINUS MMEJE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6434

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMPSON EBONIE DANIECE

THOMPSON-DAVIS ETHAN

Defendants

MMEJE HYGINUS

MMEJE THERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

5/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2024
  • Hearing04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EBONIE DANIECE THOMPSON (Plaintiff); ETHAN THOMPSON-DAVIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EBONIE DANIECE THOMPSON (Plaintiff); ETHAN THOMPSON-DAVIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN