This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 06:44:33 (UTC).

EBOBY SALAZAR VS DEANO HEALTHCARE, LLC., DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 EBOBY SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEANO HEALTHCARE, LLC , DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0237

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR EBOBY

Defendant

DEANO HEALTHCARE LLC. DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/19/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

5/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Default Prove Up Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDefault Prove Up Hearing scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Eboby Salazar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Eboby Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Deano Healthcare, LLC., dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant); Service Date: 01/25/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eboby Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Deano Healthcare, LLC., dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eboby Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Deano Healthcare, LLC., dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eboby Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Deano Healthcare, LLC., dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less