This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 13:41:21 (UTC).

EBF PARTNERS, LLC D/B/A EVEREST BUSINESS FUNDING VS YARON PINHAS GOLDMAN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 EBF PARTNERS, LLC D/B/A EVEREST BUSINESS FUNDING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YARON PINHAS GOLDMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3567

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EBF PARTNERS LLC D/B/A EVEREST BUSINESS FUNDING

EBF PARTNERS LLC DBA EVEREST BUSINESS FUNDING

Defendant

GOLDMAN YARON PINHAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DELGADO WILLIAM A.

DAVIS MICHAEL W.

Defendant Attorney

COHEN SCOTT B

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO ENFORCE SETTL...)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO ENFORCE SETTL...)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

5/11/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION (AND NOTICE) TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT YARON PINHAS GOLDMAN

5/11/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION (AND NOTICE) TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT YARON PINHAS GOLDMAN

Proof of Service by Mail

5/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO ENFORCE SETTL...)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO ENFORCE SETTL...)

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT, ON STIPULATION

6/14/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT, ON STIPULATION

Notice of Appearance

6/1/2021: Notice of Appearance

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (by Plaintiff to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Stipulated Judgment Against Defendant Yaron Pinhas Goldman) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Enforce Settl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketJudgment (by Court, on Stipulation); Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Yaron Pinhas Goldman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (by Plaintiff to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Stipulated Judgment Against Defendant Yaron Pinhas Goldman) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Enforce Settl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (- Plaintiff EBF Partners, LLC's Notice of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Stipulated Judgment Against Defendant Yaron Pinhas Goldman); Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (- Declaration of Michael W. Davis in Support of Plaintiff EBF Partners, LLC's Ex Parte Application to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Stipulated Agreement and Enter Stipulated Judgment Against Defendant Yaron Pinhas Goldman); Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint (For Breach of Contract (Settlement Agreement)); Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EBF Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ebf Partners Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELGADO WILLIAM ALEXANDER