This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:30:17 (UTC).

EBELL, DONALD LEE - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 EBELL, DONALD LEE - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUAREZ, DANIEL and BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2317

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JUAREZ, DANIEL

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASSEUR MARIA

Not Classified By Court

EBELL DONALD LEE

SUPERIOR COURT

BITETT ALAN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GRUEN RANDY D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Bond (Suretec Insurance Company ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Order (Order Vacating Prior Confirmation Order Dated April 2, 2018 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Rejected Proposed Order (- via Email )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Confirmation of Sale Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Randy Gruen re Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Declaration (17STPB02317 - Supplemental Declaration of Maria Vasseur Re Report of Sale and Petition for Order Confirming Sale of Real Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Notice - Hearing (17STPB02317 - Notice of Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale (17STPB02317 - Report of Sale and Petition for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Report - Court Appointed Counsel; Filed by PVP Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Order - Appointing Counsel; Filed by PVP Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Notification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition - Appoint Conservator of Person Only (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Confidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Doctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Confidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less