This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 13:04:37 (UTC).

EATON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 EATON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0474

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EATON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EATON LUKE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2) IN SUPPORT OF STATUTORY EXTENSION FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

8/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2) IN SUPPORT OF STATUTORY EXTENSION FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/31/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eaton Construction Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(a)(2) IN SUPPORT OF STATUTORY EXTENSION FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT); Filed by Methodist Hospital of Southern California, a California non-profit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eaton Construction Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eaton Construction Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eaton Construction Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eaton, Luke N.