This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 08:03:24 (UTC).

E T BUILDERS, INC. VS ZLATA TAUBER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 E T BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZLATA TAUBER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA A. BEAUDET and DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7734

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA A. BEAUDET

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

E T BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

E T BUILDERS INC.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

EDRY TOMMY TOMER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

IEP III LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SPECIALIST MEDICAL PHARMACY A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

EXECUTIVE TIMEPIECES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KZCK WOODBOURNE INC DBA DOUGIES WOODBOURNE AN INCORPORATION STATE UNKNOWN

JADEITE MANAGEMENT LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REVERE JEWELS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

TAUBER ZLATA

KLEIN HAIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BONIADI ANDRE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARCUS STEPHEN

MARCUS STEPHEN H.

 

Court Documents

Other - - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

1/25/2021: Other - - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/26/2021

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WHETHER TO ORDER MSC)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WHETHER TO ORDER MSC)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2020: Order - ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

11/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/24/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/7/2019: Complaint

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-A, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-A, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department STL-A, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by E T BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less