This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 08:41:16 (UTC).

E. 37TH ST. PROPERTY, CO., L.P. VS BO DO KO USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 E 37TH ST PROPERTY, CO , L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BO DO KO USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIVIA ROSALES, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and DEBRA COLE-HALL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0814

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OLIVIA ROSALES

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

DEBRA COLE-HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E. 37TH ST. PROPERTY CO. L.P.

Defendants

BO DO KO USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KIM OK CHOI

JUNK YONG BAIK DBA BO DO KO WORLD INC. AND INDIVIDUALLY

BO DO KO WORLD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JUNG KAREN

Other Attorneys

GREEN G. RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice of Continuance

3/1/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CON...)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CON...)

Notice - NOTICE EXHIBIT 19 TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

4/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE EXHIBIT 19 TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE...)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

10/8/2021: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/A...)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/A...)

Case Management Statement

9/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

6/21/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. on 12/31/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Yong Baik Junk (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - With Prejudice as to the Entire Action: Name Extension: - With Prejudice as to the Entire Action; As To Parties changed from Yong Baik Junk (Defendant), Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) to Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Yong Baik Junk (Defendant), Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (time estimate for trial is 1-2 days) scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department K updated: Result Date to 05/03/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 04/27/2022 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNotice Exhibit 19 to Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief; Filed by: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Yong Baik Junk (Defendant); As to: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Order to Show Cause Re...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Yong Baik Junk (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Yong Baik Junk (Defendant); As to: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); OK Choi Kim (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); OK Choi Kim (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: E. 37th St. Property, Co., L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Bo Do Ko USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); OK Choi Kim (Defendant); Bo Do Ko World, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BO DO KO USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN G. RICHARD