Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:18:29 (UTC).

DZUNG NGUYEN VS SAHARA BELTRAN ESQUEDA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 DZUNG NGUYEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAHARA BELTRAN ESQUEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3910

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN DZUNG

Defendant

ESQUEDA SAHARA BELTRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

Other Attorneys

GOLDSMAN GENE

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

3/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/26/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sahara Beltran Esqueda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sahara Beltran Esqueda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sahara Beltran Esqueda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dzung Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dzung Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dzung Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dzung Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less