This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 09:25:41 (UTC).

DYP ENTERPRISES, INC. VS ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 DYP ENTERPRISES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1282

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DYP ENTERPRISES INC.

Respondent

ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WOLFF NANCY E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

4/7/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DYP Enterprises, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by DYP Enterprises, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC is a litigant