This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 22:23:36 (UTC).

DYNEKA COLLIER VS 1940 CARMEN LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 DYNEKA COLLIER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against 1940 CARMEN LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8101

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLIER DYNEKA

Defendants

1940 CARMEN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

STEIN ALEXANDER G.

STEIN ESTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE KRISTEN E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WEISER FRANK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/19/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

10/7/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alexander G. Stein (Defendant); Esther Stein (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dyneka Collier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1940 CARMEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAKE KRISTEN ELIZABETH