This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 18:48:47 (UTC).

DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, L VS ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0405

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DWG INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BUILT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOFIO JOHN MATTHEW

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION FKA SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUILT INC. A CORPORATION;

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE ELANA R.

SALTZ MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorneys

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER

WORTHE TODD CHRISTOPHER

GAGNE CARLA J.

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

GREENBERG STEPHANIE

Cross Defendant Attorney

WORTHE TODD C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

9/12/2023: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 02/02/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Notice of Related Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

3/16/2022: Association of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

3/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

3/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

3/7/2022: Cross-Complaint

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2024
  • Hearing01/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant); As to: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 09/14/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 04/11/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 21STCV40405, and 22STCV36845 consolidated; case number 21STCV40405 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/12/2021; Service Cost: 151.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/15/2021; Service Cost: 151.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas Corporation (Defendant); As to: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less