This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2023 at 08:41:24 (UTC).

DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, L VS ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0405

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DWG INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE FOR HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BUILT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOFIO JOHN MATTHEW

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION FKA SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUILT INC. A CORPORATION;

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE ELANA R.

SALTZ MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorneys

WORTHE TODD CHRISTOPHER

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER

WORTHE TODD C.

GAGNE CARLA J.

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

GREENBERG STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Order (name extension) Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE

10/11/2023: Order (name extension) Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE

10/11/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

9/20/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

9/12/2023: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

4/11/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

3/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 02/02/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)

2/2/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)

Notice of Related Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

3/16/2022: Association of Attorney

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

3/10/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/24/2024

Hearing06/24/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2024

Hearing06/14/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/29/2024

Hearing02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketOrder [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE; Signed and Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial (5-7 day estimate) scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/24/2024 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/14/2024 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketAddress for Todd C. Worthe (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE: Status Date changed from 10/11/2023 to 10/11/2023 ; Name Extension changed from [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE to GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE ; Result Date changed from 10/02/2023 to 10/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
01/06/2022

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/12/2021; Service Cost: 151.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/15/2021; Service Cost: 151.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketAnswer; Filed by: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas Corporation (Defendant); As to: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DWG International, LLC, a California limited liability company, on behalf of itself and as assignee for Hollywood and Ivar, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rock of Ages Hollywood, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUILT, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); JOHN MATTHEW SOFIO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less