This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:34:30 (UTC).

DURAZO PORK INC., VS CANDELARIOS SUPER MARKET

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 DURAZO PORK INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANDELARIOS SUPER MARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DUKES, ROBERT A. and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9687

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DUKES, ROBERT A.

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DURAZO PARK INC.

DURAZO PORK INC.

Defendants

CANDELARIO JUAN

CANDELARIOS SUPER MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PASTWICK ANDREW H. LAW OFFICES OF

PASTWICK ANDREW HENRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2017: Complaint

Summons

10/6/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

10/6/2017: Unknown

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

1/25/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

1/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

1/29/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/30/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

1/31/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/31/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/1/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/6/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Unknown

3/6/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/6/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy) of 05/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Durazo Pork, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY PHONE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department O, Dukes, Robert A., Presiding; Court Order (RE: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILINGAND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Durazo Pork, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Durazo Pork, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Durazo Pork, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9687    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: O

Plaintiff's application for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice for the following reasons:

1. Lack of interest computations, including attestation of date of default on the contract. (CRC 3.1800(a)(3); 10% for contracts – Civ. Code ; 3289.)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Candelarios Super Market, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASTWICK, ANDREW H