This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2022 at 03:20:00 (UTC).

DURAN BANNER, ET AL. VS TERRI ANN POWYS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DURAN BANNER, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TERRI ANN POWYS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2495

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANNER DURAN

BANNER KARESHA

Defendant

POWYS TERRI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYNER WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/21/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/21/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/21/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/21/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/6/2022: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2025
  • Hearing01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • Hearing07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant); As to: Duran Banner (Plaintiff); Karesha Banner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Duran Banner (Plaintiff); Karesha Banner (Plaintiff); As to: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant); Service Date: 03/30/2022; Service Cost: 91.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Duran Banner (Plaintiff); Karesha Banner (Plaintiff); As to: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Duran Banner (Plaintiff); Karesha Banner (Plaintiff); As to: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Duran Banner (Plaintiff); Karesha Banner (Plaintiff); As to: Terri Ann Powys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE