This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 01:40:47 (UTC).

DUNS CAPITAL LLC VS STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 DUNS CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STARR INDEMNITY LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2274

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNS CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERNOFF BIDART ECHEVERRIA LLP

Defendant Attorney

CHURAN AMY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/3/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/3/2017: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

11/3/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DUNS CAPITAL, LLC

12/13/2017: DEFENDANT STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DUNS CAPITAL, LLC

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

12/18/2017: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF FILING OF REMOVAL, OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

12/18/2017: NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF FILING OF REMOVAL, OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

4/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Duns Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; (OSC RE Dismissal; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF FILING OF REMOVAL, OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 28 U.S.C. 1446

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DUNS CAPITAL, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Duns Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Duns Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUNS CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant