This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 01:40:45 (UTC).

DUNN SHEILA, ET AL. VS RODD S MCMINN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 DUNN SHEILA filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against RODD S MCMINN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9518

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHEILA DUNN

DUNN RUSSELL

Defendants

METLIFE SECURITIES INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

WEALTH MANAGEMENT GROUP OF UPSTATE NEW YORK INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

MCMINN RODD S

SOLINSKI MICHAEL

METLIFE SECURITIES INC.

HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

WEALTH MANAGEMENT GROUP OF UPSTATE NEWYORK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGURA JACOB N

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS WENDY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REVIEW OF R...) OF 08/09/2019

8/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REVIEW OF R...) OF 08/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REVIEW OF R...)

8/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REVIEW OF R...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

7/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/3/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

5/9/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Status Conference (ReReview of Removal/Remand Order) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Review of R...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Review of R...) of 08/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:59 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rodd S McMinn (Defendant); Wealth Management Group of UPstate NewYork, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Solinski (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dunn Sheila (Plaintiff); Russell Dunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dunn Sheila (Plaintiff); Russell Dunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dunn Sheila (Plaintiff); Russell Dunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSI Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartford Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS WENDY MAY