This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 00:29:15 (UTC).

DUNCAN RALPH VELEZ III VS JOHN ANTHONY DOMINGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 DUNCAN RALPH VELEZ III filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN ANTHONY DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0785

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELEZ III DUNCAN RALPH

Defendants

GARDNER TRUCKING INC.

DOMINGUEZ JOHN ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EASTON W. DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/17/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/30/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Duncan Ralph Velez III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Duncan Ralph Velez III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Duncan Ralph Velez III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Duncan Ralph Velez III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDNER TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTON W. DOUGLAS