This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2022 at 04:19:22 (UTC).

DUNCAN DAW VS TREVINO TESSO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 DUNCAN DAW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TREVINO TESSO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3306

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAW DUNCAN

Defendants

POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC.

TESSO TREVINO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/23/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Substitution of Attorney

9/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

5/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DUNCAN DAW (Plaintiff); POWELL CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by DUNCAN DAW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DUNCAN DAW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DUNCAN DAW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DUNCAN DAW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC. is a litigant