This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 13:47:48 (UTC).

DULLEY, KATIE VS DULLEY, ANDREW STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 DULLEY, KATIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DULLEY, ANDREW STEPHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOSLEY, GIA G and WEINER, TIMOTHY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1189

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOSLEY, GIA G

WEINER, TIMOTHY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DULLEY KATIE

Respondent

DULLEY ANDREW STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEVINE KENZIE

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

Respondent Attorney

STANKOWSKI JULIE DRAZEN

 

Court Documents

170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

12/10/2021: 170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

Proof of Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Service

Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

1/31/2022: Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement)

Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing - -Agreement

1/31/2022: Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing - -Agreement

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

3/1/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Notice - Notice (Comment)

3/7/2022: Notice - Notice (Comment)

Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

3/7/2022: Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

FCS-Mediation Memo

12/7/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/9/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail

12/9/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - UCCJEA

12/9/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

12/9/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Minute Order

12/16/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/22/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/22/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

10/22/2021: Summons

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support

10/22/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Reschedule Hearing (-Agreement ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in As Assigned, Weiner, Timothy M., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Hearing re: Peremptory Challenge - Transfer - Other Dept - Per 170.6 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE KENZIE