Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 20:53:43 (UTC).

DULCE SOLANO VS PARADIS CALIFORNIA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 DULCE SOLANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PARADIS CALIFORNIA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2001

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLANO DULCE

Defendants

HERNANDEZ JESUS

THOMAS ALBERT

PARADIS CALIFORNIA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YOSHIDA DAVID YUJI

Other Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA

CHAMI POUYA B.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: COURT RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6

4/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: COURT RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6

Notice of Settlement

4/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

3/5/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT PARADIS CALIFORNIA, LLC ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT PARADIS CALIFORNIA, LLC ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT ALBERT THOMAS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT ALBERT THOMAS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT JESUS HERNANDEZ ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF POUYA CHAMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT JESUS HERNANDEZ ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/2/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (Re Albert Thomas) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (Re Defendant Paradis California) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (Re Defendant Jesus Hernandez) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: COURT RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6); Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Pouya Chami in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Matters in Requests for Admission, Set One to Defendant Jesus Hernandez Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paradis California, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Albert Thomas (Defendant); Jesus Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dulce Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMI POUYA B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMI POUYA