This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 05:45:32 (UTC).

DUKKI MIN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 DUKKI MIN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6527

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALICEDES SANCHEZ AS TRUSTEE OF THE SANCHEZ FAMILY TRUST

ANNA VASQUEZ AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF ANAIS DE LA RONDA

CHOU CHLOE TSE-CHI

DUKKI MIN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE MIN FAMILY TRUST

ELSABBAGH AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AIMAN A . ALSABBAGH ZENIAB ABDALLAH

ELSABBAGH ZENIAB ABDALLAH

ERROL FRANCIS AS TRUSTEE FOR THE NAVICKAS FAMILY TRUST

JEFFREY KAISER AS TRUSTEE OF THE JEFFREY P. KAISER FAMILY TRUST

JULIANA MIN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE MIN FAMILY TRUST

KAISER JEFFREY PHILIP

KAREN IRENE LANER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE KAREN I LANER LIVING TRUST

LANER KAREN IRENE

LAZARO SILIO

MICHAEL SUPPAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHAEL SUPPAN AND VIRGINIA SENDINO-SUPPAN REVOCABLE FAMILY TRUST

MIN DUKKI

MIN ERICA KYUNGHYE

MIN JESSICA KYUNGEUN

MIN JULIANA

MIN JULIANA KIM

Defendant

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANTZ JAMES P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED RELATED CASE

11/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED RELATED CASE

Proof of Service by Posting - PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING OF NOVEMBER 10, 2021 MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Posting - PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING OF NOVEMBER 10, 2021 MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE;)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE;) OF 11/10/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

11/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE;) OF 11/10/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

11/10/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/20/2021

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/31/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order RE Newly Assigned Related Case); Filed by Dukki Min (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting (of November 10, 2021 Minute Order and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Dukki Min (Plaintiff); Juliana Kim Min (Plaintiff); Erica Kyunghye Min (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:50 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case;) of 11/10/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 11:55 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 10/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dukki Min (Plaintiff); Juliana Kim Min (Plaintiff); Erica Kyunghye Min (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dukki Min (Plaintiff); Juliana Kim Min (Plaintiff); Erica Kyunghye Min (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dukki Min (Plaintiff); Juliana Kim Min (Plaintiff); Erica Kyunghye Min (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANTZ JAMES PATRICK