This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 12:38:04 (UTC).

DUKE REALTY LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, AN INDIANA CORPORATION VS HK GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 DUKE REALTY LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, AN INDIANA CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against HK GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3371

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUKE REALTY LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Respondent

HK GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE CINDY JINA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING

1/13/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice of Hearing on Petition - DECLARATION OF CINDY J. LEE RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

1/22/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - DECLARATION OF CINDY J. LEE RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE *RELATED TO CASE #: 19STCV12019- LE...)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE *RELATED TO CASE #: 19STCV12019- LE...)

Notice of Ruling

2/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Petition - PETITION (AMENDED) TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

2/5/2021: Petition - PETITION (AMENDED) TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CINDY J. LEE ISO INTEREST CALCULATION

2/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CINDY J. LEE ISO INTEREST CALCULATION

Judgment - ORDER [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

3/2/2021: Judgment - ORDER [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/7/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/15/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Mail

12/16/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

10/15/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re (Proposed) Judgment Re Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Initial Statu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Cindy J. Lee iso Interest Calculation); Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference); Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 11/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Duke Realty Limited Liability Partnership, an Indiana corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03371    Hearing Date: February 26, 2021    Dept: 52

TENTATIVE RULING:

PETITIONER DUKE REALTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP’S AMENDED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

The court having read the papers and there being no opposition rules as follows:

Proof of Service

CCP § 1290.4(a) requires service of the petition and written notice of the time and place of the hearing be served in accordance with the arbitration agreement. Paragraph 11.2 of both agreements provides, “Written notice shall be deemed to have been duly served if delivered in person or sent by (1) registered, or certified mail, or overnight delivery (next business day) to [HK General Contractors, 23091 Antonio Pkwy #325, Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688] or (2) electronic transmission (e.g. facsimile, email) with a hard-copy delivered within seven (7) days after the transmission.”

Petitioner has provided sufficient proof of service in accordance with the arbitration agreements. The Proof of Service shows petitioner served the Amended Petition on February 5, 2021 by certified mail to HK General Contractors, Inc. at 23091 Antonio Parkway, Suite 325, Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688.

Merits

As required by CCP § 1285.4, the Amended Petition sets forth (a) a copy of the agreements to arbitrate; (b) the arbitrator’s name; and (c) a copy of the arbitration award.

HK General Contractors did not file a response and therefore admits the allegations of the petition. (CCP § 1290.)

The Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is GRANTED.

Respondent HK General Contractors is liable and must pay to petitioner Duke Realty Limited Partnership $1,227,066.49 in damages plus $15,940 in arbitration fees and costs for a total of $1,243,006.49.

Petitioner is ordered to file a Proposed Judgment in accordance with the final arbitration award.

Please contact Department 52 at SMCDEPT52@lacourt.org to advise the courtroom staff if parties are submitting on the court’s tentative ruling. Please provide the Case Name, Case Number, and party.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HK GENERAL CONTRACTOR A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA H K GENERAL CONTRACTORS AKA HK GENERAL CONTRACTORS; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE CINDY JINA