Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 02:19:33 (UTC).

DRR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 DRR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7733

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WIRTZ RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/2/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Hearing05/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DRR, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DRR, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DRR, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DRR, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIRTZ RICHARD M.