This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 10:19:46 (UTC).

DRISZEL SALCEDO, ET AL. VS ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 DRISZEL SALCEDO, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0820

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ DOROTHY ANNE

MONTANEZ EDGAR

SALCEDO DRISZEL

Defendants

ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS INC.

LOPEZ ZAMORA MAURICIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BABAEE SHIREEN

GRIFFIN JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/20/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/20/2023: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/23/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/23/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/19/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

7/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/7/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/12/2023: Case Management Statement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant); As to: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/21/2023; Service Cost: 78.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: Ledezma Law-Trial Lawyers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Shireen Babaee (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Ledezma Robles & Babaee LLP to Ledezma Law-Trial Lawyers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Driszel Salcedo (Plaintiff); Edgar Montanez (Plaintiff); Kendrick Montanez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad litem Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); Dorothy Anne Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ecology Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant); Mauricio Lopez Zamora (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less