This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 13:53:04 (UTC).

DREW LEONARD, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 DREW LEONARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3637

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEONARD DREW

LEONARD JANICE

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDS EUGENE P

CARTER RICHARD D

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

1/13/2022: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Re: Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Drew Leonard (Plaintiff); Janice Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Drew Leonard (Plaintiff); Janice Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Drew Leonard (Plaintiff); Janice Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location; Filed by Drew Leonard (Plaintiff); Janice Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant