This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 06:24:31 (UTC).

DR. STEWART LUCAS MURREY VS SHERYL MARTINEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 DR STEWART LUCAS MURREY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SHERYL MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURREY DR. STEWART LUCAS

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendants

POER SHANNYN

FELDMAN JASON

KRISOF KENT

EDWARDS FLOR

Walnut, CA 91789

KRISTOF AND KRISTOF ATTORNEYS AT LAW

CLARKE STEVE

MARTINEZ SHERYL

THE LAW OFFICE OF JASON K. FELDMAN PC

KESMIRI KAVEH

THE LAW OFFICE OF KAVEH KESHMIRI

KRISTOF DENISE

SINSHEIMER SHANNON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN JASON KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/2/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/5/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/9/2019: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

6/13/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/14/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/14/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Separate Statement

6/14/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. STEWART LUCAS MURREY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

6/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. STEWART LUCAS MURREY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/14/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/14/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

6/14/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Order (Permitting Pretrial Discovery Regarding Defendant's Profits and Financial Condition) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Order (Permitting Pretrial Discovery Regarding Defendant's Profits and Financial Condition) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff); Steve Clarke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Compliant For Damages; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN JASON K.