This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:37:44 (UTC).

DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG VS RAYMOND CHIHWEI LI

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 DR SHANG-JUNG YANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAYMOND CHIHWEI LI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9368

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANG DR. SHANG-JUNG

Defendants

LIN GARY

LI RAYMOND CHIHWEI

IMPAX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WONG DIXON

WONG DIXON YICK-SUN

Defendant Attorney

WU SAM X.J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summons

6/8/2017: Summons

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/29/2018: Unknown

Other -

6/5/2018: Other -

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

Brief

6/25/2018: Brief

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/28/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice

7/11/2018: Notice

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

7/31/2018: Motion to Compel

Notice

9/5/2018: Notice

Notice

9/11/2018: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

9/13/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

9/18/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application

3/27/2019: Ex Parte Application

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (the Answer of Defendant Impax, Inc.) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (the Answer of Defendant Raymond Li) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Trial Readiness Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike the Answer of Defendant Impax, In...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Order (Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (.) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Dixon Wong in Support of Motion for Order Striking Answer of Defendant Raymond Chihwei Li); Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Answer (stricken as to Impax Inc. and Raymond Chihwei Li); Filed by GARY LIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DR. SHANG-JUNG YANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less