This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:09:19 (UTC).

DR. RONIT MOLKO VS C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 DR RONIT MOLKO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8501

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLKO DR. RONIT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM INC.

2316 PELHAM AVENUE LLC

Cross Defendants

O'ROURKE CONSTRUCTION

HANLEYS WELDING

MAPCO CONSTRUCTION INC.

TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS

H.E. REMODELING

HENDERSON HEATING & AIR CONDITONING

FRANCO PLUMBING

PENINSULA GLASS & MIRROE

PLUMBING FRANCO

PLASTERING RODRIGUEZ

BELMAX FLOOR COMPANY

RBH INSULATION

WELDING HANLEYS

INSULATION RBH

ED'S RAIN GUTTERS INC.

RODRIGUEZ PLASTERING

REMODELING H.E.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TARAN DAVID A.

ROSENMAN STEVEN A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNEDY & SOUZA

OLIVA JOSEPH L.

JAMES P. SOUZA

SOUZA JAMES P.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SPRINGEL & FINK

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

SCHONEMAN TINA L.

HARTSUYKER. STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

THARPE & HOWELL LLP

JACOBS PAUL N

MILANI ANTHONY R.

MARANTZ PAMELA J.

O'CONNOR BRIAN

LOUIS LENA MARILEE

Other Attorneys

ZIMET MARC JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/30/2019: Answer

Answer

7/10/2018: Answer

Answer

7/26/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2018: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

8/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Other -

8/28/2018: Other -

Case Management Statement

8/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

8/29/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

8/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2018: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

9/12/2018: Cross-Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ultimate Installz., Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ultimate Installz., Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE); Filed by DR. RONIT MOLKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (DEFENDANT C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/ BUILD FIRM, INC.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF ADVANCE PAYMENT OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT, IS FILED THIS DATE. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DR. RONIT MOLKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DR. RONIT MOLKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DR. RONIT MOLKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8501    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: P

 

Dr. Ronit Molko v. C&C Partners Design/Build Firm, Inc. Case No. ****8501

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Hearing Date: December 16, 2019

TENTATIVE RULING

In this construction defect case plaintiff sought $1.4 million. Plaintiff entered into a settlement agreement wherein multiple contractor and sub-contractor defendants will pay amounts ranging from $3,500 to $200,000 (with the largest payment to be made jointly by defendants C&C and Pelham) for a total settlement of $443,500.00.  The settling parties now move for a determination of good faith settlement under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. ;877.6.

Any settling party can apply for a determination of good faith settlement. Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. ;877.6. To receive approval, the settlement amount must be within the reasonable range, or “within the ballpark” of the settling tortfeasor’s share of liability for the plaintiff’s injuries. Tech-Bilt, Inc. v. Woodward-Clyde Assocs. (1985) 38 Cal.3d 488, 499.

No party asserted a lack of good faith. The settling parties present evidence, in the form of an expert declaration from a general contractor, indicating the settlement reasonably reflects the actual cost of repair as well as each defendant’s proportionate responsibility. All evidence presented indicates this agreement was reached after extensive arms-length negotiations between the parties, and that there was no collusion or other wrongful conduct aimed to harm the interests of the non-settling parties. Motion GRANTED.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPCO CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where O'ROURKE CONSTRUCTION is a litigant