This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 01:30:58 (UTC).

DR JASON EMER VS CLAUDIA WITMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 DR JASON EMER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against CLAUDIA WITMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5720

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMER DR. JASON

Defendant

WITMAN CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBEIDY A. ANDREW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/10/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/25/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

7/10/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/11/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. LIBEL 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

8/7/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. LIBEL 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/28/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. LIBEL 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS, ETC

9/17/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. LIBEL 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS, ETC

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

10/15/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Certificate of Mailing for

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice

10/24/2018: Notice

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/2/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order

12/11/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

12/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

1/7/2019: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the First Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (replaintiff's failure to file default Judg) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (replaintiff's failure to proceed with a request for entry of default) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against plaintiff and/or counsel for failure to appear on 01/07/19) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against plaintiff and/or counsel for failure to appear on January 7, 2019) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (plaintiff's failure to proceed with a request for entry of default) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (plaintiff's failure to file default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the First Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against plaintiff and/or counsel for failure to appear on January 7, 2019) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (plaintiff's failure to proceed with a request for entry of default) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. LIBEL 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dr. Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

SFILED

I [|A. ANDREW OBEIDY, ESQ. (FBN 0910341) - Superior Court of California OBEIDY & ASSOCIATES, P. A. County of Los Angeles 2755 East Oakland Park B]Vd., Suite 225 | FEB 2 7 2018

Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33306

Telephone: (305) 892-5454 Sherri R. Carter, Executixe Officer/Clepk BYM, Depu

Attorney for Plaintiff Dr. Jason Emer Moses Soto

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CASE NO.: M

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Dr. Jason Emer, an individual

I3 PRELIMINARY ALLEGATIONS

19 | (Parties)

20 1) Plaintiff Dr. Jason Emer (“Plaintiff,” hereinafter) is, and at all times material hereto was,

an individual residing in the county of Los Angeles, state of California.