This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2023 at 06:15:15 (UTC).

DR. COMFORT, A DIVISION OF DJO SURGICAL VS HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 DR COMFORT, A DIVISION OF DJO SURGICAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0125

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR. COMFORT A DIVISION OF DJO SURGICAL

Defendant

HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN

Defendant Attorney

GHENCIU VLAD RAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against All Parties And Their Respective Attorneys for Failure to Consummate Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against All Parties And Their Respective Attorneys for Failure to Consummate Settlement scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/23/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted: Name Extension changed from Declaration of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted to of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted: Name Extension changed from Declaration of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted to of Alan L. Brodkin Re Defendant Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc.'s motion for an order deeming matters in requests for admissions set one admitted ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Set...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Set One, and For an Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff, Dr. Comfort and/or Its Counsel of Record in The Amount of $1,810.00, Filed by Human Designs Prosthetic and Orthotic Laboratory, Inc. scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: DR. COMFORT, a division of DJO SURGICAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DR. COMFORT, a division of DJO SURGICAL (Plaintiff); As to: HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DR. COMFORT, a division of DJO SURGICAL (Plaintiff); As to: HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DR. COMFORT, a division of DJO SURGICAL (Plaintiff); As to: HUMAN DESIGNS PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC LABORATORY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less