This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:25:25 (UTC).

DR. ALBERT PARLOW VS LUNDQUIST INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL INNOVATION AT HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 DR ALBERT PARLOW filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LUNDQUIST INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL INNOVATION AT HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8021

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARLOW DR. ALBERT

Defendants

GOLDEN WEST BIOLOGICALS INC.

LUNDQUIST INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL INNOVATION AT HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Related Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • Hearing09/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Hearing09/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Lundquist Institute for Biomedical Innovation At Harbor-UCLA Medical Center (Defendant); Golden West Biologicals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dr. Albert Parlow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dr. Albert Parlow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dr. Albert Parlow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LUNDQUIST INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL INNOVATION AT HARBOR UCLA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS PAUL