This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 00:28:33 (UTC).

DPOJ, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 DPOJ, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0099

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DPOJ LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

EMPIRE DEMOLITION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOLLACOTT JAY ALAN

Defendant Attorney

ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Empire Demolition, Inc., A California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by DPOJ, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DPOJ, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DPOJ, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DPOJ, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DPOJ, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPIRE DEMOLITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE