Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 18:27:29 (UTC).

DOYENART, LINDA ENDRY SAFITRE VS DOYENART, WALTER GABRIEL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 DOYENART, LINDA ENDRY SAFITRE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DOYENART, WALTER GABRIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0217

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOYENART LINDA ENDRY SAFITRE

Respondent

DOYENART WALTER GABRIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

3/18/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons

3/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons - Issued

2/16/2021: Summons - Issued

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/16/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/16/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

2/16/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/16/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

2/16/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less