This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 00:38:41 (UTC).

DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS JAIR BRACAMONTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 DOWNTOWN L A LAW GROUP, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAIR BRACAMONTES, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4415

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP LLP

Defendants

LA ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALIST UNKNOWN ENTITY

RENAISSANCE IMAGING MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOLDEN STATE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALIST UNKNOWN ENTITY

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ENA M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL MATTHEW

SHIN IMAGINA CENTER UNKNOWN ENTITY

DILANCHIAN CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

K AND B SURGICAL CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BRACAMONTES AN INDIVIDUAL JAIR

KOHANIM CHIROPRACTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CITY OF LOS ANGELES FIRE DEPARTMENT A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPORTS REHABILITATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BRACAMONTES JAIR

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION

CITY OF LOS ANGELES FIRE DEPARTMENT

DILANCHIAN CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION

ENA MATTHEW M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

WEDDERBURN MICHELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

10/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Settlement

10/18/2021: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. WEDDERBURN IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

10/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. WEDDERBURN IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 10/19/2021

10/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 10/19/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

11/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/1/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

7/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against counsel for Dignity Health for FTA 8/11/21; and a Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 3:13 PM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 10/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michelle A. Wedderburn In Opposition to OSC for Failure to Appear); Filed by DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit benefit corporation Erroneously Sued As California Hospital Medical Center Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DIGNITY HEALTH, a California non-profit benefit corporation Erroneously Sued As California Hospital Medical Center Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Downtown L.A. Law Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DILANCHIAN CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where K AND B SURGICAL CENTER LL is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant