This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 19:08:57 (UTC).

DOWNEY-MONTEBELLO SPECIAL EDUCATION LOCAL PLAN AREA, ET AL. VS BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 DOWNEY-MONTEBELLO SPECIAL EDUCATION LOCAL PLAN AREA, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOWNEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOWNEY-MONTEBELLO SPECIAL EDUCATION LOCAL PLAN AREA

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANFORTH SCOTT DALE

ZAMORA-MEJIA ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorneys

BATHEN ERIC JOHN

BRADY MARCIA PAGE

BRADY RICHARD DALE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE

12/16/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Motion to Transfer

12/13/2021: Motion to Transfer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order

1/13/2022: Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/13/2022

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/13/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

1/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

2/2/2022: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

2/2/2022: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

2/2/2022: Receipt for Transmitted Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT ORDER); Filed by Bellflower Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/13/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Bellflower Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Transfer - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue); Filed by Bellflower Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Filed by Bellflower Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Downey-Montebello Special Education Local Plan Area (Plaintiff); Downey Unified School District (Plaintiff); Montebello Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Downey-Montebello Special Education Local Plan Area (Plaintiff); Downey Unified School District (Plaintiff); Montebello Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Downey-Montebello Special Education Local Plan Area (Plaintiff); Downey Unified School District (Plaintiff); Montebello Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Downey-Montebello Special Education Local Plan Area (Plaintiff); Downey Unified School District (Plaintiff); Montebello Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less