This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 01:42:51 (UTC).

DOWLING PROPERTIES, INC. VS JUDY L. TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 DOWLING PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JUDY L TAYLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7616

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOWLING PROPERTIES INC.

Defendants

ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OWNERSHIP

TAYLOR JUDY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERIDAN THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

BOON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

6/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 06/25/2021

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 06/25/2021

Notice of Settlement

4/1/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/07/2021

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/31/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

1/9/2020: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/9/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

12/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

12/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/21/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 06/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 57; Non-Jury Trial (, 1-2 day estimate,) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 57; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 2:43 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Judy L. Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Judy L. Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of Action); Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dowling Properties, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheridan, Thomas Blaine