Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 00:10:40 (UTC).

DOUGLAS GALLEGO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS PHARMAVITE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 DOUGLAS GALLEGO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PHARMAVITE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8852

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALLEGO AN INDIVIDUAL DOUGLAS

GALLEGO DOUGLAS

Defendants

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

PHARMAVITE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PHARMAVITE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GONZALES TIMOTHY

GONZALES TIMOTHY J.

Defendant Attorney

DOMEK NATASHA L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Refund / Order

9/25/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2019

10/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/02/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN T. COOK PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

8/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN T. COOK PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATASHA L. DOMEK IN SUPPORT OF DEF. NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE 170.6

7/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATASHA L. DOMEK IN SUPPORT OF DEF. NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE 170.6

Answer

7/25/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/30/2019: Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Douglas Gallego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pharmavite LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Natasha L. Domek in support of def. notice of peremptory challenge 170.6); Filed by Pharmavite LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Pharmavite LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pharmavite LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Douglas Gallego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Douglas Gallego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Douglas Gallego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Douglas Gallego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALES TIMOTHY J.