This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:57:33 (UTC).

DOROTHY HAMBLIN, TRUSTEE OF THE HAMBLIN FAMILY TRUST VS VIDAUDIO.COM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 DOROTHY HAMBLIN, TRUSTEE OF THE HAMBLIN FAMILY TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIDAUDIO COM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0624

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOROTHY HAMBLIN TRUSTEE OF THE HAMBLIN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOWLING TOBY

VIDAUDIO.COM

VIDAUDIO SYSTEMS INC.

Cross Defendants

GM PROPERTIES INC.

WAGNER MATT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GRAY PAUL BRYAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

YACKO TOM NICHOLAS

PEIRANO CRISTIAN LUIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

3/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/12/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

3/5/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

2/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE ALIAS VIDAUDIO.COM

2/8/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE ALIAS VIDAUDIO.COM

Cross-Complaint

2/2/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

1/29/2021: Answer

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VIDAUDIO SYSTEMS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Toby Dowling (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer To Cross-Complaint; Filed by GM Properties, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Matt Wagner (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Toby Dowling (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Toby Dowling (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (re Alias Vidaudio.com); Filed by Toby Dowling (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Toby Dowling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Toby Dowling (Cross-Complainant); Toby Dowling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Toby Dowling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dorothy Hamblin, Trustee of the Hamblin Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GM PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAY PAUL BRYAN