This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 16:07:55 (UTC).

DOROTHY FAYE TYUS ROWE VS FOOD 4 LESS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 DOROTHY FAYE TYUS ROWE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2778

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROWE DOROTHY FAYE TYUS

Defendants

DOE JOHN

FOOD 4 LESS

KROGER WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATALE SILVIO

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/6/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

7/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/23/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Food 4 Less (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Food 4 Less (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Dorothy Faye Tyus Rowe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dorothy Faye Tyus Rowe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dorothy Faye Tyus Rowe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dorothy Faye Tyus Rowe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dorothy Faye Tyus Rowe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant