This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:35:53 (UTC).

DORJI, INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TONY HSU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 DORJI, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TONY HSU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0809

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORJI INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

HSU TONY

JACKYMOON CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WANDA INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MA RICK X.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/6/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dorji, Inc.a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dorji, Inc.a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dorji, Inc.a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dorji, Inc.a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACKYMOON CORP. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MA RICK X.