This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:19:12 (UTC).

DORIS SELINE CABRAL DE LEIJA VS SERGIO ANTONIO ACUNA CELADA

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 DORIS SELINE CABRAL DE LEIJA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERGIO ANTONIO ACUNA CELADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3583

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DE LEIJA DORIS SELINE CABRAL

Defendants and Respondents

CELADA SERGIO ANTONIO ACUNA

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

PEACH INC. DOE 2 DBA ACTION MESSENGER SERVICE A CORPORATE ENTITY

AMAZON.COM INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CARRAZCO LAW APC

Defendant Attorneys

KINNEY CHRISTIANE ELYN

FIOLA NAAMAN ASIR

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Answer

10/16/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/18/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/18/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/18/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/18/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

4/23/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/23/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sergio Antonio Acuna Celada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Sergio Antonio Acuna Celada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Doris Seline Cabral De Leija (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703583    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DORIS SELINE CABRAL DE LEIJA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SERGIO ANTONIO ACUNA CELADA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC703583

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 14, 2019

Plaintiff propounded RFAs on Defendant, Celada on 1/24/19.  To date, despite multiple extensions of time to respond and attempts to meet and confer, Defendant has not served verified responses to the RFAs (Defendant did serve unverified responses, which are tantamount to no responses at all; see Appleton v. Superior Court (1988) 206 Cal.App.3d 632, 636).  Plaintiff therefore seeks an order deeming the RFAs admitted and requiring Defendant and Defense Counsel to pay sanctions.

Plaintiff’s motion to deem RFAs admitted is granted.  CCP §2033.280(b).

Sanctions are mandatory.  §2033.280(c).  Plaintiff seeks sanctions in the amount of $1110.  Counsel bills at the rate of $350/hour; the Court reduces this billing rate to $200/hour, which is more in line with the rates charged in the personal injury courts.  The Court awards one hour of time to prepare this form discovery motion.  No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary.  The Court is confused about Counsel’s statement, at ¶9 of his declaration, that “I have included my time for appearing in my declaration associated with plaintiff’s motion to compel Request for Admissions and do not seek that time here.”  There was only one motion filed, and there is only one motion on calendar today.  The Court awards two hours of time to appear at the hearing on the motion.   

The Court therefore awards a total of three hours of attorney time at the rate $200/hour, or $600 in attorneys’ fees.  The Court also awards the filing fee of $60.  Sanctions are sought against and imposed against Defendant and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Plaintiff, by and through his attorney of record, in the amount of $660, within twenty days.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.