This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2022 at 14:24:15 (UTC).

DORIS MIRO VS FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 DORIS MIRO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0889

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRO DORIS

Defendant

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLAZAK DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

SCHER GREGORY B

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/5/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/20/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Answer

11/28/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant); As to: Doris Miro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Doris Miro (Plaintiff); As to: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2022; Service Cost: 93.01; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Doris Miro (Plaintiff); As to: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Doris Miro (Plaintiff); As to: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Doris Miro (Plaintiff); As to: Fire Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less