This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 12:05:44 (UTC).

DORIS FAY WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ALEJANDRA GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 DORIS FAY WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEJANDRA GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5319

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS AN INDIVIDUAL DORIS FAY

Defendants

CORTES AVALOS AN INDIVIDUAL FERNANDO

GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL ALEJANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/5/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/5/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/5/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2024
  • Hearing08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DORIS FAY WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DORIS FAY WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DORIS FAY WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less