This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 11:21:06 (UTC).

DORIS ANN FILLER VS CHARLES RAMSDELL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 DORIS ANN FILLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHARLES RAMSDELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7053

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FILLER DORIS ANN

Defendants and Respondents

RAMSDELL CHARLES

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VICTOR L. GEORGE

TRAN ELVIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBBS PATRICK J. ESQ.

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH ESQ.

KEESAL SAMUEL AARON JR

CARPENTER-BRIDWELL SHIRLEY ANN

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/8/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/8/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/8/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Witness List - [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

9/20/2019: Witness List - [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

Jury Instructions - [PROPOSED] JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS

9/20/2019: Jury Instructions - [PROPOSED] JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Statement of the Case - [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

9/20/2019: Statement of the Case - [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFEN...)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFEN...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (LINDA LEE, CSR #13568)

6/21/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (LINDA LEE, CSR #13568)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

5/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

5/8/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORIS ANN FILLER IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR STATUTORY PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

4/23/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORIS ANN FILLER IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR STATUTORY PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEYLIN P. ALFARO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STATUTORY PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

4/23/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEYLIN P. ALFARO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STATUTORY PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/25/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE.

9/22/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Doris Ann Filler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Doris Ann Filler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 1:54 PM in Department 4B; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...) of 09/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Doris Ann Filler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Charles Ramsdell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charles Ramsdell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Charles Ramsdell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Doris Ann Filler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Doris Ann Filler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH