This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 01:39:08 (UTC).

DORIAN O. BURTON, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF SYLVIA VS CHARLES MORTIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 DORIAN O BURTON, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF SYLVIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHARLES MORTIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4532

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORIAN O. BURTON ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF SYLVIA

Defendants

MORTIS CHARLES

THE ESTATE OF WINSTON KERR RAHBURN

THE ESTATE OF EUNICE MORTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRICKLAND MICHELLE D.

Defendant Attorneys

SANDS THOMAS

SANDS THOMAS D.

Other Attorneys

STRICKLAND MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Stipulation for Judgment

5/16/2022: Stipulation for Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

3/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS D. SANDS

10/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS D. SANDS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

5/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/4/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ((Settlement)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by Charles Mortis (Defendant); The Estate of Eunice Mortis (Defendant); The Estate of Winston Kerr Rahburn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Non-Jury Trial ((1 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charles Mortis (Defendant); The Estate of Eunice Mortis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dorian O. Burton, Administrator of the Estate of Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND MICHELLE