This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 09:03:22 (UTC).

DORA RODRIGUEZ VS VATCHE BARDKAJIAN, M.D.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 DORA RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against VATCHE BARDKAJIAN, M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1328

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ DORA

Defendant

BARDKAJIAN VATCHE M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

LUCERO LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 07/12/2021

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 07/12/2021

Order - Dismissal

7/12/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/21/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 07/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dora Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dora Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dora Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA