This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 09:52:42 (UTC).

DORA NOEMI SANTOS VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 DORA NOEMI SANTOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3106

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTOS DORA NOEMI

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEHORAY SIAMAK EBRAHIM

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN MICHAEL G.

NAVARRO SAMANTHA G

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

11/5/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/10/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dora Noemi Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dora Noemi Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dora Noemi Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dora Noemi Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MICHAEL G. ESQ.