This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:31:18 (UTC).

DORA LUZ SOLANO VS. AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 DORA LUZ SOLANO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN A. TORRIBIO, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, HIGA, ROBERT J., MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6087

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN A. TORRIBIO

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

HIGA, ROBERT J.

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

SOLANO DORA LUZ

Respondents and Defendants

AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK INC.

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMES T. IMPERIALE ESQ.

RICHARD W. SNYDER ESQ.(LIMITED SCOPE)

GAUGH KENNETH RAY

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK LLP

RIBAR GWEN HEATHER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/30/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

1/30/2017: Unknown

Summons

1/30/2017: Summons

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/21/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Application

2/28/2017: Application

Order for Publication

2/28/2017: Order for Publication

Proof of Publication

4/11/2017: Proof of Publication

Unknown

4/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/11/2017: Unknown

Brief

7/3/2017: Brief

Minute Order

7/5/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

7/5/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/6/2017: Unknown

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department G, John A. Torribio, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Amended); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (PROOF OF SERVICE FOR APPEAL PER COURT ORDER); Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketJudgment (for Quiet Title in Favor of Plaintiff and Against American Mortgage Network, Inc and U.S. Bank, N.A.); Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:1/28/19 B295522); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Default (NOA 1/28/19); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DORA LUZ SOLANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6087    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: SEG

DORA LUZ SOLANO v. AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK. INC., et al.

CASE NO.: ****6087

HEARING: 2/19/20

TENTATIVE ORDER

The Court has two motions before it:

Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside Court Order Vacating the Default Judgment against U.S. Bank is DENIED. See discussion below.

U.S. Bank’s Motion for Imposition of Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $4,999.00 Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s Counsel Pursuant to C.C.P. section 128.7 is GRANTED as requested.

U.S. Bank was dismissed from this lawsuit on June 12, 2018. See Order of Dismissal attached hereto as Exhibit 1. Since U.S. Bank was no longer a party to the action, the Court entry of judgment against it was void as a matter of law.

It does not take statues or case law to hold that a person/entity who is not a party to an action may have a judgment rendered against him/her/it.

The past entry of default and notices of a default prove up are irrelevant in the absence of being a party. The actions of pursuing the claim against U.S. Bank are frivolous per se. The following findings are made:

1) Moving Party has complied with the “safe harbor” provisions and the time to comply has lapsed.

2) The pursuant of the motion to reinstate judgment is completely without merit.

3) Fees and Costs requested are reasonable

4) Fee and Costs of $4,999.00 are awarded against Plaintiff and her counsel; due and payable within 30 days of service of this ruling. This order is joint and severable.



Case Number: ****6087    Hearing Date: January 02, 2020    Dept: SEC

SOLANO v. AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC.

CASE NO.:  ****6087

HEARING:  01/02/20

#8

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION’s Motion for CCP ;128.7 Sanctions is CONTINUED to Wednesday, January 29, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Dept. SE-G to be heard in conjunction with Plaintiff’s Motion to Vacate the Court’s August 5, 2019 Order.

Moving Party to give notice.

The parties are further ORDERED to deliver courtesy copies of any corresponding Moving, Opposition, and Reply papers directly to Dept. SE-G on or before January 21, 2020.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIBAR GWEN H. ESQ.