This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 00:12:13 (UTC).

DORA GALVEZ-CABEZA, ET AL. VS HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 DORA GALVEZ-CABEZA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3452

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALVEZ-CABEZA DORA

CABEZA NICOLAS

Defendants

HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL

MASKIN M.D. JONATHAN

KOCH M.D. CHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEINBERG STEVE J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/3/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES {\PAR} {\PAR}

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES {\PAR} {\PAR}

Demand for Jury Trial

12/9/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2021: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff); Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff); Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates {\par} {\par}); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff); Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff); Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dora Galvez-Cabeza (Plaintiff); Nicolas Cabeza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINBERG STEVEN JAY