This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:13:57 (UTC).

DOPP, KENT GLOVER - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 DOPP, KENT GLOVER - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6309

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOPP W. KIRK

Claimant

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Decedent

DOPP KENT GLOVER

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY ARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ARTIS TAB L

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/25/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

6/25/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/19/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/27/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

8/26/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Minute Order

8/24/2021: Minute Order

Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

8/31/2021: Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

Creditor's Claim

8/31/2021: Creditor's Claim

Bond - western

10/8/2021: Bond - western

Letters (Initial)

11/1/2021: Letters (Initial)

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- Final

3/8/2022: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- Final

Withdrawal - Special Notice

4/12/2022: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Miscellaneous Document - -Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim $14,806.88

4/12/2022: Miscellaneous Document - -Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim $14,806.88

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (-Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim $14,806.88 ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketWithdrawal - Special Notice; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal- Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketBond (western ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (No Fee); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on June 25, 2021 by W. Kirk Dopp. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.